Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Hamilton, Howard, Gollihare, Jech, Standridge, Kirt, Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Dollens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Olsen (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|