Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023