Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB290 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/12/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 473 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 290 	By: Hamilton 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to conduct of elections; am ending 26 
O.S. 2021, Section 2 -129, which relates to 
compensation of precinct officials; increasing 
compensation for certain election offici als; 
conforming language; and declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     26 O.S. 2021, Section 2 -129, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 2-129. A.  1.  For any election held on or after July 
1, 2020, and prior to July 1, 2024, the inspector shall be paid One 
Hundred Ten Dollars ($110.00). 
2.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2024, and prior to 
July 1, 2028, the inspector shall be paid One Hundred Twenty -five 
Dollars ($125.00). 
3.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2028 the effective 
date of this act, the inspector shall be paid One Hundred Fifty 
Dollars ($150.00) Two Hundred Twenty-five Dollars ($225.00). 
B.  1.  For any election hel d on or after July 1, 2020, and 
prior to July 1, 2024, judges and clerks shall b e paid One Hundred 
Dollars ($100.00).   
 
 
Req. No. 473 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2024, and prior to 
July 1, 2028, judges and clerks shall be paid One Hundred Fifteen 
Dollars ($115.00). 
3.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2028 the effective 
date of this act, judges and clerks shall be paid One Hundred Thirty 
Dollars ($130.00) Two Hundred Dollars ($200.00). 
C. B.  Precinct officials assigned to work a polling place ten 
(10) miles or more from their home, shall be allowed mileage 
reimbursement at the rate provided by the State Travel Reim bursement 
Act for mileage incurred from their ho me to and from their assigned 
polling place.  In ad dition, inspectors shall be allowed mileage 
reimbursement at the rate provided by the State Travel Reimbursement 
Act for mileage incurred to receive or retur n ballots and materials 
for the election. 
D. C.  Compensation and mileage reimbursement provided herein 
shall be paid for any election conducted by a county election board. 
E. D.  1.  Five Dollars ($5.00) of the compensation described in 
subsections A, and B and C of this section shall be paid by the 
county election board from county funds and the remai nder shall be 
paid by the State Election Board for all regular Primary, Runoff 
Primary and General Elections for state and federal offices, for the 
Presidential Preferential Primary Election, and for all s tatewide 
special elections and all special election s for United States   
 
 
Req. No. 473 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Representatives or United States Senators and State Senators or 
State Representatives. 
2. Except for elections described in paragraph 1 of this 
subsection, for all other elections cond ucted by a county election 
board, the entity for wh ich the election is being conducted shall 
pay the compensation and mileage reimbursement described in 
subsections A, and B, and C of this section; provided, if an 
election for more than one entity is condu cted in the same precinct, 
the entities shall equal ly share the cost of precinct official 
compensation and mileage reimbursement for that precinct. 
F. E. The secretary of the county election board may appoint 
volunteer precinct officials who shall not rec eive the compensation 
provided herein by this section. 
SECTION 2.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passag e and approval. 
 
59-1-473 TEK 1/12/2023 10:28:31 AM