Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB290 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB290 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 15, 2023 
AS AMENDED 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 290 	By: Hamilton, Burns, and Boren 
 
 
 
 
 
[ elections - compensation -  
 	emergency ] 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.    AMENDATORY     26 O.S. 2021, Section 2 -129, is 
amended to read as fol lows: 
Section 2-129. A.  1.  For any election held on or after July 
1, 2020, and prior to July 1, 2024, the inspector shall be paid One 
Hundred Ten Dollars ($110.00). 
2.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2024, and prior to 
July 1, 2028, the inspector shall be paid One Hundred Twenty -five 
Dollars ($125.00). 
3.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2028 the effective 
date of this act, the inspector shall be paid One Hundred Fifty 
Dollars ($150.00) Two Hundred Twenty-five Dollars ($225.00). 
B.  1.  For any election hel d on or after July 1, 2020, and 
prior to July 1, 2024, judges and clerks shall b e paid One Hundred 
Dollars ($100.00).   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB290 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2024, and prior to 
July 1, 2028, judges and clerks shall be paid One Hundred Fifteen 
Dollars ($115.00). 
3.  For any election held on or after July 1, 2028 the effective 
date of this act, judges and clerks shall be paid One Hundred Thirty 
Dollars ($130.00) Two Hundred Dollars ($200.00). 
C. B.  Precinct officials assigned to work a polling place ten 
(10) miles or more from their home, shall be allowed mileage 
reimbursement at the rate provided by the State Travel Reim bursement 
Act for mileage incurred from their home to and from their assigned 
polling place.  In addition, inspectors shall be allowed mileage 
reimbursement at the rate provided by the State Travel Reimbursement 
Act for mileage incurred to receive or retur n ballots and materials 
for the election. 
D. C.  Compensation and mileage reimbursement provided herein 
shall be paid for any election conducted by a county election board. 
E. D.  1.  Five Dollars ($5.00) of the compensation described in 
subsections A, and B and C of this section shall be paid by the 
county election board from county funds and the remainder shall be 
paid by the State Election Board for all regular Primary, Runoff 
Primary and General Elections for state and federal offices, for the 
Presidential Preferential Primary Election, and for all statewide 
special elections and all special elections for United States   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB290 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Representatives or United States Senators and State Senators or 
State Representatives. 
2. Except for elections described in paragraph 1 of this 
subsection, for all other elect ions conducted by a county election 
board, the entity for which the election is being conducted shall 
pay the compensation and mileage reimbursement described in 
subsections A, and B, and C of this section; provided, if an 
election for more than one entity is conducted in the same precinct, 
the entities shall equally share the cost of precinct official 
compensation and mileage reimbursement for that precinct. 
F. E. The secretary of the county election board may appoint 
volunteer precinct officials who shal l not receive the compensation 
provided herein by this section. 
SECTION 2.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shal l take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage an d approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
February 15, 2023 - DO PASS AS AMENDED