Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB300 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023