Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 22
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 50
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Hays
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Conley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|