Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 2, 2023