Senate | 04/25/2024 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 37 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Kevin) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Emergency removed | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Dahm |