Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024