Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Staires (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|