Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 65 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 43
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Nichols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Matthews
|
|
|