Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023