Senate | 04/24/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 25 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Remove Senator Daniels as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Paxton | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |