Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB518 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 8, 2023