Senate | 04/28/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Remove as principal author Representative Pfeiffer and substitute with Representative Kendrix | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader |