Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB607 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2023