Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 32; Ayes: 58 Nays: 29
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 68 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hill
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 54
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Pugh, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Seifried, Weaver, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer, Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|