Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB621 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023