Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Tedford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Schreiber
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SCs changed Alvord, Garvin, Hamilton, Murdock, Pugh, Stewart, Young to Alvord, Brooks, Garvin, Paxton, Pemberton, Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
CCR rejected, further conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
SCs changed Stanley to Pugh
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
SCs named Stanley, Garvin, Stewart, Alvord, Hamilton, Murdock, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|