Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB684 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023