Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass Civil Judiciary | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Civil Judiciary | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Harris |