Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2622 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2025

Amended

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill March 9, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2025