Senate | 04/17/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert, Dobrinski | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Energy and Natural Resources Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Utilities | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Energy and Natural Resources Oversight | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |