Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2752 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2025

Amended

Bill April 16, 2025
Bill February 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2025