Senate | 04/30/2025 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Oversight Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Energy and Natural Resources Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Utilities | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources Oversight | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Reported Do Pass Business and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Business and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Archer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Green |