Senate | 05/05/2025 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2025 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | CR; Do Pass Education Oversight Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Education Oversight committee; Do Pass Common Education | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Common Education | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Education Oversight | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Seifried |