Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB794 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Amended

Bill April 23, 2025
Bill February 26, 2025