House | 04/06/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/06/2023) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |