Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6089 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- H 6089
66 ========
77 LC002010
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N
1515 EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES, AND REQUIRING
1616 REAPPOINTMENT OF THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO
1717 STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT ,
1818 HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT , AND REGULATION
1919 Introduced By: Representatives Giraldo, Speakman, Shekarchi, Solomon, Donovan,
2020 Biah, and Chippendale
2121 Date Introduced: March 03, 2023
2222 Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing
2323
2424
2525 RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 139 1
2626 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 2
2727 25, 2021, entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE 3
2828 COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, 4
2929 DEVELOPMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION" and as extended by 5
3030 resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and 6
3131 approved March 24, 2022, entitled “HOUSE RESOLUTION EXTENDING THE REPORTING 7
3232 AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY 8
3333 THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT, H OUSING, 9
3434 ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION” is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a 10
3535 report to the House of Representatives on or before June 8, 2025, and said commission shall 11
3636 expire on June 30, 2025; and be it further 12
3737 RESOLVED, That membership in said commission shall be subject to and at the 13
3838 discretion of reappointment by the Speaker of the House through submission of a letter of interest 14
3939 to be submitted to the Speaker of the House by July 1, 2023; and be it further 15
4040 RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 139 passed by the 16
4141 House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 25, 2021, and as 17
4242 extended by resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 18
4343
4444
4545 LC002010 - Page 2 of 3
4646 A.D. 2022, and approved March 24, 2022, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 1
4747 ========
4848 LC002010
4949 ========
5050
5151
5252 LC002010 - Page 3 of 3
5353 EXPLANATION
5454 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
5555 OF
5656 H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N
5757 EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES, AND REQUIRING
5858 REAPPOINTMENT OF THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO
5959 STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT ,
6060 HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT , AND REGULATION
6161 ***
6262 This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates and requires a letter of 1
6363 continued interest to the speaker for reappointment of membership, to the special legislative 2
6464 commission to study the entire area of land use, preservation, development, housing, 3
6565 environment, and regulation, from June 8, 2023, to June 8, 2025, and said commission would 4
6666 expire on June 30, 2025. 5
6767 ========
6868 LC002010
6969 ========