House | 05/26/2023 | Referred to House Veterans Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |