House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
03/19/2025 | Scrivener's error corrected | |||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Read third time and sent to House | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Roll call Ayes-xxx Nays-xxx | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read second time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |