South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina Senate Bill S0170 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026
22
33 Bill 170
44
55 Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter
66
77 (Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)
88
9- Indicates Matter Stricken Indicates New Matter Committee Amendment Adopted March 13, 2025 S. 170 Introduced by Senators Hembree, Kimbrell, Stubbs, Matthews, Garrett, Adams, Graham and Zell S. Printed 3/13/25--S. [SEC 3/19/2025 12:47 PM] Read the first time January 14, 2025 ________
9+ Indicates Matter Stricken Indicates New Matter Committee Amendment Adopted March 13, 2025 S. 170 Introduced by Senators Hembree, Kimbrell, Stubbs, Matthews, Garrett, Adams, Graham and Zell S. Printed 3/13/25--S. [SEC 3/18/2025 5:50 PM] Read the first time January 14, 2025 ________
1010
1111 Indicates Matter Stricken
1212
1313 Indicates New Matter
1414
1515
1616
1717 Committee Amendment Adopted
1818
1919 March 13, 2025
2020
2121
2222
2323 S. 170
2424
2525
2626
2727 Introduced by Senators Hembree, Kimbrell, Stubbs, Matthews, Garrett, Adams, Graham and Zell
2828
2929
3030
31-S. Printed 3/13/25--S. [SEC 3/19/2025 12:47 PM]
31+S. Printed 3/13/25--S. [SEC 3/18/2025 5:50 PM]
3232
3333 Read the first time January 14, 2025
3434
3535
3636
3737 ________
3838
39- A bill TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY ADDING SECTION 44-7-387 SO AS TO REQUIRE A LICENSED FACILITY TO ADOPT AND IMPLEMENT POLICIES TO PREVENT EXPOSURE TO SURGICAL SMOKE BY REQURING THE USE OF A SMOKE EVACUATION SYSTEM. Amend Title To Conform Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina: SECTION 1. Chapter 7, Title 44 of the S.C. Code is amended by adding: Section 44-7-387. (A) As used in this section: (1) "Surgical smoke" means the gaseous by-product produced by energy-generating devices such as lasers and electrosurgical devices. The term includes, but is not limited to, surgical plume, smoke plume, bio-aerosols, laser-generated airborne contaminants, or lung-damaging dust. (2) "Smoke evacuation system" means equipment that effectively captures and filters surgical smoke at the site of origin before the smoke makes contact with the eyes or the respiratory tract of occupants in the room. (3) "Licensed facility" means a hospital or ambulatory surgical facility as defined in Section 44-7-130. (B) A licensed facility must adopt and implement policies to prevent exposure to surgical smoke by requiring the use of a smoke evacuation system during any surgical procedure that is likely to generate surgical smoke. SECTION 2. This act takes effect on July 1, 2026, except that for the following hospitals this act takes effect January 1, 2027: (1) hospitals certified as critical access hospitals pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1395i-4; (2) hospitals with fewer than fifty acute care beds in operation; (3) hospitals certified by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services as sole community hospitals; (4) hospitals that qualify as a Medicare dependent hospital; and (5) hospitals with six or fewer operating rooms. ----XX----
39+ A bill TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY ADDING SECTION 44-7-387 SO AS TO REQUIRE A LICENSED FACILITY TO ADOPT AND IMPLEMENT POLICIES TO PREVENT EXPOSURE TO SURGICAL SMOKE BY REQURING THE USE OF A SMOKE EVACUATION SYSTEM. Amend Title To Conform Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina: SECTION 1. Chapter 7, Title 44 of the S.C. Code is amended by adding: Section 44-7-387. (A) As used in this section: (1) "Surgical smoke" means the gaseous by-product produced by energy-generating devices such as lasers and electrosurgical devices. The term includes, but is not limited to, surgical plume, smoke plume, bio-aerosols, laser-generated airborne contaminants, or lung-damaging dust. (2) "Smoke evacuation system" means equipment that effectively captures and filters surgical smoke at the site of origin before the smoke makes contact with the eyes or the respiratory tract of occupants in the room. (3) "Licensed facility" means a hospital or ambulatory surgical facility as defined in Section 44-7-130. (B) A licensed facility must adopt and implement policies to prevent exposure to surgical smoke by requiring the use of a smoke evacuation system during any surgical procedure that is likely to generate surgical smoke. SECTION 2. July 1, 2026, except that for the following hospitals this act takes effect January 1, 2027: (1) hospitals certified as critical access hospitals pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1395i-4; (2) hospitals with fewer than fifty acute care beds in operation; (3) hospitals certified by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services as sole community hospitals; (4) hospitals that qualify as a Medicare dependent hospital; and (5) hospitals with six or fewer operating rooms. ----XX----
4040
4141
4242
4343
4444
4545
4646
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151
5252
5353
5454
5555
5656
5757 A bill
5858
5959
6060
6161 TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY ADDING SECTION 44-7-387 SO AS TO REQUIRE A LICENSED FACILITY TO ADOPT AND IMPLEMENT POLICIES TO PREVENT EXPOSURE TO SURGICAL SMOKE BY REQURING THE USE OF A SMOKE EVACUATION SYSTEM.
6262
6363 Amend Title To Conform
6464
6565
6666
6767 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina:
6868
6969
7070
7171 SECTION 1. Chapter 7, Title 44 of the S.C. Code is amended by adding:
7272
7373
7474
7575 Section 44-7-387. (A) As used in this section:
7676
7777 (1) "Surgical smoke" means the gaseous by-product produced by energy-generating devices such as lasers and electrosurgical devices. The term includes, but is not limited to, surgical plume, smoke plume, bio-aerosols, laser-generated airborne contaminants, or lung-damaging dust.
7878
7979 (2) "Smoke evacuation system" means equipment that effectively captures and filters surgical smoke at the site of origin before the smoke makes contact with the eyes or the respiratory tract of occupants in the room.
8080
8181 (3) "Licensed facility" means a hospital or ambulatory surgical facility as defined in Section 44-7-130.
8282
8383 (B) A licensed facility must adopt and implement policies to prevent exposure to surgical smoke by requiring the use of a smoke evacuation system during any surgical procedure that is likely to generate surgical smoke.
8484
8585
8686
87-SECTION 2. This act takes effect on July 1, 2026, except that for the following hospitals this act takes effect January 1, 2027:
87+SECTION 2. July 1, 2026, except that for the following hospitals this act takes effect January 1, 2027:
8888
8989 (1) hospitals certified as critical access hospitals pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1395i-4;
9090
9191 (2) hospitals with fewer than fifty acute care beds in operation;
9292
9393 (3) hospitals certified by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services as sole community
9494
9595 hospitals;
9696
9797 (4) hospitals that qualify as a Medicare dependent hospital; and
9898
9999 (5) hospitals with six or fewer operating rooms.
100100
101101 ----XX----
102102
103-This web page was last updated on March 19, 2025 at 12:48 PM
103+This web page was last updated on March 18, 2025 at 05:52 PM