LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
South Carolina SC
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0170
Draft Versions
SC
South Carolina Senate Bill S0170
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session
South Carolina Senate Bill S0170
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 19, 2025
Bill
January 14, 2025
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
March 19, 2025
Compare
Bill
March 18, 2025
Compare
Bill
March 13, 2025
Compare
Bill
March 11, 2025
Compare