1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 171 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to consideration of mitigating factors in determining |
---|
6 | 6 | | appropriate disciplinary action to be taken against a public school |
---|
7 | 7 | | student. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 37.001(a), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
10 | 10 | | read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) The board of trustees of an independent school district |
---|
12 | 12 | | shall, with the advice of its district-level committee established |
---|
13 | 13 | | under Subchapter F, Chapter 11, adopt a student code of conduct for |
---|
14 | 14 | | the district. The student code of conduct must be posted and |
---|
15 | 15 | | prominently displayed at each school campus or made available for |
---|
16 | 16 | | review at the office of the campus principal. In addition to |
---|
17 | 17 | | establishing standards for student conduct, the student code of |
---|
18 | 18 | | conduct must: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) specify the circumstances, in accordance with this |
---|
20 | 20 | | subchapter, under which a student may be removed from a classroom, |
---|
21 | 21 | | campus, or disciplinary alternative education program; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) specify conditions that authorize or require a |
---|
23 | 23 | | principal or other appropriate administrator to transfer a student |
---|
24 | 24 | | to a disciplinary alternative education program; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (3) outline conditions under which a student may be |
---|
26 | 26 | | suspended as provided by Section 37.005 or expelled as provided by |
---|
27 | 27 | | Section 37.007; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (4) specify that [whether] consideration will be [is] |
---|
29 | 29 | | given, as a factor in each [a] decision concerning [to order] |
---|
30 | 30 | | suspension, removal to a disciplinary alternative education |
---|
31 | 31 | | program, [or] expulsion, or placement in a juvenile justice |
---|
32 | 32 | | alternative education program, regardless of whether the decision |
---|
33 | 33 | | concerns a mandatory or discretionary action, to: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (A) self-defense; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (B) intent or lack of intent at the time the |
---|
36 | 36 | | student engaged in the conduct; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (C) a student's disciplinary history; or |
---|
38 | 38 | | (D) a disability that substantially impairs the |
---|
39 | 39 | | student's capacity to appreciate the wrongfulness of the student's |
---|
40 | 40 | | conduct; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (5) provide guidelines for setting the length of a |
---|
42 | 42 | | term of: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (A) a removal under Section 37.006; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | (B) an expulsion under Section 37.007; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (6) address the notification of a student's parent or |
---|
46 | 46 | | guardian of a violation of the student code of conduct committed by |
---|
47 | 47 | | the student that results in suspension, removal to a disciplinary |
---|
48 | 48 | | alternative education program, or expulsion; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (7) prohibit bullying, harassment, and making hit |
---|
50 | 50 | | lists and ensure that district employees enforce those |
---|
51 | 51 | | prohibitions; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | (8) provide, as appropriate for students at each grade |
---|
53 | 53 | | level, methods, including options, for: |
---|
54 | 54 | | (A) managing students in the classroom and on |
---|
55 | 55 | | school grounds; |
---|
56 | 56 | | (B) disciplining students; and |
---|
57 | 57 | | (C) preventing and intervening in student |
---|
58 | 58 | | discipline problems, including bullying, harassment, and making |
---|
59 | 59 | | hit lists. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010 |
---|
61 | 61 | | school year. |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
63 | 63 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
64 | 64 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
65 | 65 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
66 | 66 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
67 | 67 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
68 | 68 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
69 | 69 | | I certify that H.B. No. 171 was passed by the House on May 1, |
---|
70 | 70 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 93, Nays 48, 1 present, not |
---|
71 | 71 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
72 | 72 | | H.B. No. 171 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
73 | 73 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
74 | 74 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
75 | 75 | | on H.B. No. 171 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, |
---|
76 | 76 | | Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
77 | 77 | | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | 78 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
79 | 79 | | I certify that H.B. No. 171 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
80 | 80 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
81 | 81 | | 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
82 | 82 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
83 | 83 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
84 | 84 | | 171 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
87 | 87 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
88 | 88 | | Date |
---|
89 | 89 | | __________________ |
---|
90 | 90 | | Governor |
---|