Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB171 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 171


 AN ACT
 relating to consideration of mitigating factors in determining
 appropriate disciplinary action to be taken against a public school
 student.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 37.001(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) The board of trustees of an independent school district
 shall, with the advice of its district-level committee established
 under Subchapter F, Chapter 11, adopt a student code of conduct for
 the district. The student code of conduct must be posted and
 prominently displayed at each school campus or made available for
 review at the office of the campus principal. In addition to
 establishing standards for student conduct, the student code of
 conduct must:
 (1) specify the circumstances, in accordance with this
 subchapter, under which a student may be removed from a classroom,
 campus, or disciplinary alternative education program;
 (2) specify conditions that authorize or require a
 principal or other appropriate administrator to transfer a student
 to a disciplinary alternative education program;
 (3) outline conditions under which a student may be
 suspended as provided by Section 37.005 or expelled as provided by
 Section 37.007;
 (4) specify that [whether] consideration will be [is]
 given, as a factor in each [a] decision concerning [to order]
 suspension, removal to a disciplinary alternative education
 program, [or] expulsion, or placement in a juvenile justice
 alternative education program, regardless of whether the decision
 concerns a mandatory or discretionary action, to:
 (A) self-defense;
 (B) intent or lack of intent at the time the
 student engaged in the conduct;
 (C) a student's disciplinary history; or
 (D) a disability that substantially impairs the
 student's capacity to appreciate the wrongfulness of the student's
 conduct;
 (5) provide guidelines for setting the length of a
 term of:
 (A) a removal under Section 37.006; and
 (B) an expulsion under Section 37.007;
 (6) address the notification of a student's parent or
 guardian of a violation of the student code of conduct committed by
 the student that results in suspension, removal to a disciplinary
 alternative education program, or expulsion;
 (7) prohibit bullying, harassment, and making hit
 lists and ensure that district employees enforce those
 prohibitions; and
 (8) provide, as appropriate for students at each grade
 level, methods, including options, for:
 (A) managing students in the classroom and on
 school grounds;
 (B) disciplining students; and
 (C) preventing and intervening in student
 discipline problems, including bullying, harassment, and making
 hit lists.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 171 was passed by the House on May 1,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 93, Nays 48, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 171 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 171 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 171 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 171 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor