House | 04/24/2009 | Returned to Calendars Committee | Journal Page: 1799 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 41 | Journal Page: 1799 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1799 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |