Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2109 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R23102 BEF-F
 By: Geren H.B. No. 2109
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2109:
 By: Davis of Dallas C.S.H.B. No. 2109


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain applicants for a vehicle
 dealer general distinguishing number complete a dealer education
 course.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 503.029, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
 (d)  An applicant for an original dealer general
 distinguishing number who proposes to be an independent motor
 vehicle dealer and who does not hold a general distinguishing
 number as a franchised motor vehicle dealer or independent  motor
 vehicle dealer must submit to the department evidence that the
 applicant completed a dealer education course, approved by the
 department, in the year preceding the date the application is
 filed.  The course must be at least 8 hours and not more than 12
 hours in length.
 (e)  The department may approve a dealer education course
 under Subsection (d) only if the provider of the course:
 (1)  is a business with experience providing compliance
 education to independent motor vehicle dealers;
 (2)  provides online and CD-ROM versions of the course
 with assessment and verification capabilities;
 (3)  provides ongoing educational support by telephone
 or the Internet for one year at no additional cost to persons who
 have completed a course;
 (4)  provides at least one instructor-led dealer
 education course each month, including at least one instructor-led
 course each year in or near:
 (A) Austin;
 (B) Dallas and Fort Worth;
 (C) El Paso;
 (D) Houston; and
 (E) San Antonio; and
 (5)  has a curriculum review panel for the course that
 consists of at least four independent motor vehicle dealers who
 hold dealer general distinguishing numbers.
 (f)  Not later than the 180th day after the date the
 department first approves a dealer education course under
 Subsection (d), each person who holds a dealer general
 distinguishing number as an independent motor vehicle dealer shall
 complete a dealer education course approved by the department. This
 subsection does not apply to a person who has previously completed a
 dealer education course approved by the department.  This
 subsection expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Section 503.029(d), Transportation Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to an application for an original
 independent motor vehicle dealer general distinguishing number
 filed with the Texas Department of Transportation on or after
 September 1, 2010. An application filed before that date is
 governed by the law in effect when the application was filed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2010, the Texas
 Department of Transportation shall begin to approve or reject
 applications from providers of dealer education courses under
 Sections 503.029(d) and (e), Transportation Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.