E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1634
|
Journal Page: 6274
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6272
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6898
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4990
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4820
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5686
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5686
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5686
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5200
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3352
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3352
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1758
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#391
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1998
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1998
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
5-Coleman, Bonnen, and Leibowitz
|
Journal Page: 1998
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1998
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/28/09 3:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/28/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Thibaut
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|