1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2347 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of |
---|
6 | 6 | | higher education for certain peace officers enrolled in criminal |
---|
7 | 7 | | justice or law enforcement course work and for certain educational |
---|
8 | 8 | | aides. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 54.208, Education Code, is amended to |
---|
11 | 11 | | read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 54.208. FIREFIGHTERS AND PEACE OFFICERS [FIREMEN] |
---|
13 | 13 | | ENROLLED IN CERTAIN [FIRE SCIENCE] COURSES. (a) The governing |
---|
14 | 14 | | board of an institution of higher education [boards of the state |
---|
15 | 15 | | institutions of collegiate rank supported in whole or in part by |
---|
16 | 16 | | public funds] shall exempt from the payment of tuition and |
---|
17 | 17 | | laboratory fees a student [any person] who is employed as a |
---|
18 | 18 | | firefighter [fireman] by a [any] political subdivision of this |
---|
19 | 19 | | [the] state and who enrolls in a course or courses offered as part |
---|
20 | 20 | | of a fire science curriculum. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The governing board of an institution of higher |
---|
22 | 22 | | education shall exempt from the payment of tuition and laboratory |
---|
23 | 23 | | fees charged by the institution for a criminal justice or law |
---|
24 | 24 | | enforcement course or courses an undergraduate student who: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) is employed as a peace officer by this state or by |
---|
26 | 26 | | a political subdivision of this state; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) is enrolled in a criminal justice or law |
---|
28 | 28 | | enforcement-related degree program at the institution; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (3) is making satisfactory academic progress toward |
---|
30 | 30 | | the student's degree as determined by the institution; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) applies for the exemption at least one week before |
---|
32 | 32 | | the last date of the institution's regular registration period for |
---|
33 | 33 | | the applicable semester or other term. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a student may not |
---|
35 | 35 | | receive an exemption under that subsection for any course if the |
---|
36 | 36 | | student has previously attempted a number of semester credit hours |
---|
37 | 37 | | for courses taken at any institution of higher education while |
---|
38 | 38 | | classified as a resident student for tuition purposes in excess of |
---|
39 | 39 | | the maximum number of those hours specified by Section 61.0595(a) |
---|
40 | 40 | | as eligible for funding under the formulas established under |
---|
41 | 41 | | Section 61.059. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (d) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the governing board of |
---|
43 | 43 | | an institution of higher education may not provide exemptions under |
---|
44 | 44 | | that subsection to students enrolled in a specific class in a number |
---|
45 | 45 | | that exceeds 20 percent of the maximum student enrollment |
---|
46 | 46 | | designated by the institution for that class. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (e) An [The] exemption provided under this section does not |
---|
48 | 48 | | apply to deposits that [which] may be required in the nature of |
---|
49 | 49 | | security for the return or proper care of property loaned for the |
---|
50 | 50 | | use of students. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (f) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall |
---|
52 | 52 | | adopt: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) rules governing the granting or denial of an |
---|
54 | 54 | | exemption under this section, including rules relating to the |
---|
55 | 55 | | determination of a student's eligibility for an exemption; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | (2) a uniform listing of degree programs covered by |
---|
57 | 57 | | the exemption under this section. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (g) If the legislature does not specifically appropriate |
---|
59 | 59 | | funds to an institution of higher education in an amount sufficient |
---|
60 | 60 | | to pay the institution's costs in complying with this section for a |
---|
61 | 61 | | semester, the governing board of the institution of higher |
---|
62 | 62 | | education shall report to the Senate Finance Committee and the |
---|
63 | 63 | | House Appropriations Committee the cost to the institution of |
---|
64 | 64 | | complying with this section for that semester. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 2. Section 54.214(d), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
66 | 66 | | read as follows: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (d) The institution of higher education at which a person |
---|
68 | 68 | | seeking an exemption under this section is enrolled [coordinating |
---|
69 | 69 | | board] must certify the [a] person's eligibility to receive the |
---|
70 | 70 | | [an] exemption [under this section]. As soon as practicable after |
---|
71 | 71 | | receiving an application for certification, the institution |
---|
72 | 72 | | [coordinating board] shall make the determination of eligibility |
---|
73 | 73 | | and give notice of its determination to the applicant[, the |
---|
74 | 74 | | institution of higher education at which the applicant is |
---|
75 | 75 | | enrolled,] and to the school district employing the applicant |
---|
76 | 76 | | [person] as an educational aide. |
---|
77 | 77 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section |
---|
78 | 78 | | 54.208, Education Code, apply beginning with tuition and laboratory |
---|
79 | 79 | | fees charged for the 2011 fall semester. Tuition and laboratory |
---|
80 | 80 | | fees charged for an academic period before the 2011 fall semester |
---|
81 | 81 | | are covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective |
---|
82 | 82 | | date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that |
---|
83 | 83 | | purpose. |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act to Section |
---|
85 | 85 | | 54.214, Education Code, applies to an exemption from tuition and |
---|
86 | 86 | | fees granted under that section beginning with the 2009 fall |
---|
87 | 87 | | semester. |
---|
88 | 88 | | SECTION 5. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of |
---|
89 | 89 | | this section, this Act takes effect immediately if this Act |
---|
90 | 90 | | receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each |
---|
91 | 91 | | house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. |
---|
92 | 92 | | If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate |
---|
93 | 93 | | effect, except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, this |
---|
94 | 94 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
95 | 95 | | (b) Sections 1 and 3 of this Act take effect January 1, 2011. |
---|
96 | 96 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
97 | 97 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
98 | 98 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2347 was passed by the House on April |
---|
99 | 99 | | 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 98, Nays 43, 1 present, not |
---|
100 | 100 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
101 | 101 | | H.B. No. 2347 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
102 | 102 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
103 | 103 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
104 | 104 | | on H.B. No. 2347 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135, |
---|
105 | 105 | | Nays 4, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
106 | 106 | | ______________________________ |
---|
107 | 107 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
108 | 108 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2347 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
109 | 109 | | amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
110 | 110 | | 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
111 | 111 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
112 | 112 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
113 | 113 | | 2347 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
114 | 114 | | ______________________________ |
---|
115 | 115 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
116 | 116 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
117 | 117 | | Date |
---|
118 | 118 | | __________________ |
---|
119 | 119 | | Governor |
---|