Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2347 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2347


 AN ACT
 relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of
 higher education for certain peace officers enrolled in criminal
 justice or law enforcement course work and for certain educational
 aides.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.208, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.208. FIREFIGHTERS AND PEACE OFFICERS [FIREMEN]
 ENROLLED IN CERTAIN [FIRE SCIENCE] COURSES. (a) The governing
 board of an institution of higher education [boards of the state
 institutions of collegiate rank supported in whole or in part by
 public funds] shall exempt from the payment of tuition and
 laboratory fees a student [any person] who is employed as a
 firefighter [fireman] by a [any] political subdivision of this
 [the] state and who enrolls in a course or courses offered as part
 of a fire science curriculum.
 (b)  The governing board of an institution of higher
 education shall exempt from the payment of tuition and laboratory
 fees charged by the institution for a criminal justice or law
 enforcement course or courses an undergraduate student who:
 (1)  is employed as a peace officer by this state or by
 a political subdivision of this state;
 (2)  is enrolled in a criminal justice or law
 enforcement-related degree program at the institution;
 (3)  is making satisfactory academic progress toward
 the student's degree as determined by the institution; and
 (4)  applies for the exemption at least one week before
 the last date of the institution's regular registration period for
 the applicable semester or other term.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a student may not
 receive an exemption under that subsection for any course if the
 student has previously attempted a number of semester credit hours
 for courses taken at any institution of higher education while
 classified as a resident student for tuition purposes in excess of
 the maximum number of those hours specified by Section 61.0595(a)
 as eligible for funding under the formulas established under
 Section 61.059.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the governing board of
 an institution of higher education may not provide exemptions under
 that subsection to students enrolled in a specific class in a number
 that exceeds 20 percent of the maximum student enrollment
 designated by the institution for that class.
 (e) An [The] exemption provided under this section does not
 apply to deposits that [which] may be required in the nature of
 security for the return or proper care of property loaned for the
 use of students.
 (f)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt:
 (1)  rules governing the granting or denial of an
 exemption under this section, including rules relating to the
 determination of a student's eligibility for an exemption; and
 (2)  a uniform listing of degree programs covered by
 the exemption under this section.
 (g)  If the legislature does not specifically appropriate
 funds to an institution of higher education in an amount sufficient
 to pay the institution's costs in complying with this section for a
 semester, the governing board of the institution of higher
 education shall report to the Senate Finance Committee and the
 House Appropriations Committee the cost to the institution of
 complying with this section for that semester.
 SECTION 2. Section 54.214(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d) The institution of higher education at which a person
 seeking an exemption under this section is enrolled [coordinating
 board] must certify the [a] person's eligibility to receive the
 [an] exemption [under this section]. As soon as practicable after
 receiving an application for certification, the institution
 [coordinating board] shall make the determination of eligibility
 and give notice of its determination to the applicant[, the
 institution of higher education at which the applicant is
 enrolled,] and to the school district employing the applicant
 [person] as an educational aide.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 54.208, Education Code, apply beginning with tuition and laboratory
 fees charged for the 2011 fall semester. Tuition and laboratory
 fees charged for an academic period before the 2011 fall semester
 are covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 54.214, Education Code, applies to an exemption from tuition and
 fees granted under that section beginning with the 2009 fall
 semester.
 SECTION 5. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect immediately if this Act
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) Sections 1 and 3 of this Act take effect January 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2347 was passed by the House on April
 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 98, Nays 43, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2347 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2347 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135,
 Nays 4, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2347 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2347 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor