E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6902
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5018
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5018
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6057
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4505
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5984
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5984
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4447
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4447
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3950
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 West
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#223
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 662
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 662
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|