Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2591 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2591


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of property tax consultants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1152.156(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) In addition to satisfying the requirements of Section
 1152.155, an applicant for registration as a property tax
 consultant must:
 (1) complete at least 40 [15] classroom hours of
 educational courses approved by the executive director, including
 at least four hours of instruction on laws and legal issues in this
 state related to property tax consulting services and pass a
 competency examination under Section 1152.160; or
 (2) if the person is eligible for registration under
 Section 1152.155(b), submit to the commission evidence that the
 applicant has completed at least four classroom hours of
 educational programs or courses on the laws and legal issues in this
 state related to property tax consulting services.
 SECTION 2. Section 1152.160, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1152.160. [SENIOR PROPERTY TAX CONSULTANT]
 REGISTRATION EXAMINATIONS [EXAMINATION]. (a) The executive
 director shall:
 (1) adopt an examination for registration as a senior
 property tax consultant; [and]
 (2) adopt an examination for registration as a
 property tax consultant; and
 (3) establish the standards for passing the
 examinations [examination].
 (b) The department shall offer the examinations
 [examination] at times and places designated by the executive
 director.
 (c) To be eligible to take an [the] examination, an
 applicant must pay to the department an examination fee.
 (d) The examination must[:
 [(1)] test the applicant's knowledge of:
 (1) [(A)] property taxation;
 (2) [(B)] the property tax system;
 (3) [(C)] property tax administration;
 (4) [(D)] ethical standards; and
 (5) [(E)] general principles of appraisal,
 accounting, and law as they relate to property tax consulting
 services[; and
 [(2)     be graded according to rules adopted by the
 commission].
 (e) An attorney who is licensed to practice law in this
 state may take the senior property tax consultant registration
 examination under this section without completing any other
 eligibility requirements for registration as a senior property tax
 consultant under this chapter.
 (f)  The department shall accept, develop, or contract for
 the examinations required by this section, including the
 administration of the examination.
 SECTION 3. Chapter 1152, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E-1. PROHIBITED ACTS
 Sec. 1152.231.  GENERAL PROHIBITED ACTS.  (a)  A person
 required to register under this chapter may not serve as a
 registered senior property tax consultant for more than 10
 registered property tax consultants unless each additional tax
 consultant sponsored or supervised by the registered senior
 property tax consultant has for the previous six months:
 (1)  been employed and engaged as a tax consultant on a
 full-time basis;
 (2)  performed tax consultant related services as an
 employee of a property owner; or
 (3) performed licensed appraisal services.
 (b)  Except for protests filed with the approval of a lessee
 under Section 41.413, Tax Code, a person required to register under
 this chapter may not file a protest under Chapter 41, Tax Code,
 without the approval of the property owner.
 (c)  A person required to register under this chapter may not
 falsify an agent appointment, exemption application, protest, or
 other legal document that is filed with or presented to an appraisal
 district, an appraisal review board, or a taxing unit.
 (d)  A person required to register under this chapter may not
 file a motion or protest concerning residential property on behalf
 of a person whom the registrant does not represent unless the
 registrant has authorization from:
 (1) that person; or
 (2)  another person, other than the agent or the firm
 that employs the agent, who is authorized by the person to designate
 agents under Section 1.111, Tax Code.
 Sec. 1152.232.  PROHIBITED ACTS: SOLICITATION OF BUSINESS.
 A person required to register under this chapter may not solicit a
 property tax consulting assignment by assuring a specific outcome.
 Sec. 1152.233.  PROHIBITED ACTS: USE OF INTERNET WEBSITE.
 (a)  A person required to register under this chapter may not
 maintain an Internet website for any purpose associated with the
 provision of tax consulting services by the registrant that has a
 domain name or other Internet address that implies that the website
 is a government website.
 (b)  A person required to register under this chapter may not
 use or maintain an Internet website for the purpose of soliciting
 clients if the website does not identify the company prominently on
 the home page of the website.
 Sec. 1152.234.  PROHIBITED ACTS: CERTAIN LEGAL ACTIONS.  A
 person required to register under this chapter may not engage the
 services of an attorney for purposes of filing an appeal under
 Chapter 42, Tax Code, without the prior consent of the client.
 SECTION 4. Not later than December 31, 2009, the executive
 director of the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
 accept, develop, or contract for the property tax consultant
 examination required by Section 1152.160, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 1152.156(a), Occupations Code, applies only to an application for
 registration as a property tax consultant that is submitted to the
 Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation on or after March 1,
 2010. An application for registration submitted before that date
 is governed by the law in effect at the time the application was
 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 6. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) Subchapter E-1, Chapter 1152, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act, takes effect January 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2591 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2591 on May 23, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2591 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2591 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 0, 1 present, not voting; at the request of the House, the Senate
 appointed a conference committee to consider the differences
 between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference
 committee report on H.B. No. 2591 on May 31, 2009, by the following
 vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor