Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2591 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 H.B. No. 2591
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the regulation of property tax consultants.
66 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
77 SECTION 1. Section 1152.156(a), Occupations Code, is
88 amended to read as follows:
99 (a) In addition to satisfying the requirements of Section
1010 1152.155, an applicant for registration as a property tax
1111 consultant must:
1212 (1) complete at least 40 [15] classroom hours of
1313 educational courses approved by the executive director, including
1414 at least four hours of instruction on laws and legal issues in this
1515 state related to property tax consulting services and pass a
1616 competency examination under Section 1152.160; or
1717 (2) if the person is eligible for registration under
1818 Section 1152.155(b), submit to the commission evidence that the
1919 applicant has completed at least four classroom hours of
2020 educational programs or courses on the laws and legal issues in this
2121 state related to property tax consulting services.
2222 SECTION 2. Section 1152.160, Occupations Code, is amended
2323 to read as follows:
2424 Sec. 1152.160. [SENIOR PROPERTY TAX CONSULTANT]
2525 REGISTRATION EXAMINATIONS [EXAMINATION]. (a) The executive
2626 director shall:
2727 (1) adopt an examination for registration as a senior
2828 property tax consultant; [and]
2929 (2) adopt an examination for registration as a
3030 property tax consultant; and
3131 (3) establish the standards for passing the
3232 examinations [examination].
3333 (b) The department shall offer the examinations
3434 [examination] at times and places designated by the executive
3535 director.
3636 (c) To be eligible to take an [the] examination, an
3737 applicant must pay to the department an examination fee.
3838 (d) The examination must[:
3939 [(1)] test the applicant's knowledge of:
4040 (1) [(A)] property taxation;
4141 (2) [(B)] the property tax system;
4242 (3) [(C)] property tax administration;
4343 (4) [(D)] ethical standards; and
4444 (5) [(E)] general principles of appraisal,
4545 accounting, and law as they relate to property tax consulting
4646 services[; and
4747 [(2) be graded according to rules adopted by the
4848 commission].
4949 (e) An attorney who is licensed to practice law in this
5050 state may take the senior property tax consultant registration
5151 examination under this section without completing any other
5252 eligibility requirements for registration as a senior property tax
5353 consultant under this chapter.
5454 (f) The department shall accept, develop, or contract for
5555 the examinations required by this section, including the
5656 administration of the examination.
5757 SECTION 3. Chapter 1152, Occupations Code, is amended by
5858 adding Subchapter E-1 to read as follows:
5959 SUBCHAPTER E-1. PROHIBITED ACTS
6060 Sec. 1152.231. GENERAL PROHIBITED ACTS. (a) A person
6161 required to register under this chapter may not serve as a
6262 registered senior property tax consultant for more than 10
6363 registered property tax consultants unless each additional tax
6464 consultant sponsored or supervised by the registered senior
6565 property tax consultant has for the previous six months:
6666 (1) been employed and engaged as a tax consultant on a
6767 full-time basis;
6868 (2) performed tax consultant related services as an
6969 employee of a property owner; or
7070 (3) performed licensed appraisal services.
7171 (b) Except for protests filed with the approval of a lessee
7272 under Section 41.413, Tax Code, a person required to register under
7373 this chapter may not file a protest under Chapter 41, Tax Code,
7474 without the approval of the property owner.
7575 (c) A person required to register under this chapter may not
7676 falsify an agent appointment, exemption application, protest, or
7777 other legal document that is filed with or presented to an appraisal
7878 district, an appraisal review board, or a taxing unit.
7979 (d) A person required to register under this chapter may not
8080 file a motion or protest concerning residential property on behalf
8181 of a person whom the registrant does not represent unless the
8282 registrant has authorization from:
8383 (1) that person; or
8484 (2) another person, other than the agent or the firm
8585 that employs the agent, who is authorized by the person to designate
8686 agents under Section 1.111, Tax Code.
8787 Sec. 1152.232. PROHIBITED ACTS: SOLICITATION OF BUSINESS.
8888 A person required to register under this chapter may not solicit a
8989 property tax consulting assignment by assuring a specific outcome.
9090 Sec. 1152.233. PROHIBITED ACTS: USE OF INTERNET WEBSITE.
9191 (a) A person required to register under this chapter may not
9292 maintain an Internet website for any purpose associated with the
9393 provision of tax consulting services by the registrant that has a
9494 domain name or other Internet address that implies that the website
9595 is a government website.
9696 (b) A person required to register under this chapter may not
9797 use or maintain an Internet website for the purpose of soliciting
9898 clients if the website does not identify the company prominently on
9999 the home page of the website.
100100 Sec. 1152.234. PROHIBITED ACTS: CERTAIN LEGAL ACTIONS. A
101101 person required to register under this chapter may not engage the
102102 services of an attorney for purposes of filing an appeal under
103103 Chapter 42, Tax Code, without the prior consent of the client.
104104 SECTION 4. Not later than December 31, 2009, the executive
105105 director of the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
106106 accept, develop, or contract for the property tax consultant
107107 examination required by Section 1152.160, Occupations Code, as
108108 amended by this Act.
109109 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act to Section
110110 1152.156(a), Occupations Code, applies only to an application for
111111 registration as a property tax consultant that is submitted to the
112112 Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation on or after March 1,
113113 2010. An application for registration submitted before that date
114114 is governed by the law in effect at the time the application was
115115 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
116116 purpose.
117117 SECTION 6. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
118118 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
119119 (b) Subchapter E-1, Chapter 1152, Occupations Code, as
120120 added by this Act, takes effect January 1, 2010.
121121 ______________________________ ______________________________
122122 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
123123 I certify that H.B. No. 2591 was passed by the House on April
124124 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
125125 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
126126 H.B. No. 2591 on May 23, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
127127 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
128128 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
129129 on H.B. No. 2591 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
130130 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
131131 ______________________________
132132 Chief Clerk of the House
133133 I certify that H.B. No. 2591 was passed by the Senate, with
134134 amendments, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
135135 0, 1 present, not voting; at the request of the House, the Senate
136136 appointed a conference committee to consider the differences
137137 between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference
138138 committee report on H.B. No. 2591 on May 31, 2009, by the following
139139 vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
140140 ______________________________
141141 Secretary of the Senate
142142 APPROVED: __________________
143143 Date
144144 __________________
145145 Governor