E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6899
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4996
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6234
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4578
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4578
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5201
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 3473
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3473
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Postponed
|
3:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3692
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3692
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|