Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2917 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2917


 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing the Department of State Health Services to
 obtain criminal history record information for certain applicants
 for employment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 411.110, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (c), and (d) and adding Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (a) The Department of State Health Services is entitled to
 obtain from the department criminal history record information
 maintained by the department that relates to:
 (1) a person who is:
 (A) an applicant for a license or certificate
 under the Emergency Medical Services Act (Chapter 773, Health and
 Safety Code);
 (B) an owner or manager of an applicant for an
 emergency medical services provider license under that Act; or
 (C) the holder of a license or certificate under
 that Act;
 (2) an applicant for a license or a license holder
 under Subchapter N, Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code; [or]
 (3) an applicant for a license, the owner or manager of
 an applicant for a massage establishment license, or a license
 holder under Chapter 455, Occupations Code;
 (4)  an applicant for employment at or current employee
 of:
 (A) the Texas Center for Infectious Disease; or
 (B) the South Texas Health Care System; or
 (5)  an applicant for employment at, current employee
 of, or person who contracts or may contract to provide goods or
 services with:
 (A)  the vital statistics unit of the Department
 of State Health Services; or
 (B)  the Council on Sex Offender Treatment or
 other division or component of the Department of State Health
 Services that monitors sexually violent predators as described by
 Section 841.003(a), Health and Safety Code.
 (c) After an entity is licensed or certified, the Department
 of State Health Services shall destroy the criminal history record
 information that relates to that entity. The Department of State
 Health Services shall destroy the criminal history record
 information that relates to:
 (1)  an applicant for employment after that applicant
 is employed or, for an applicant who is not employed, after the
 check of the criminal history record information on that applicant
 is completed; or
 (2)  an employee or contractor after the check of the
 criminal history record information on that employee or contractor
 is completed.
 (d) The Department of State Health Services shall destroy
 criminal history record information that relates to an applicant
 who [that] is not certified or employed, as applicable.
 (f)  The Department of State Health Services may not consider
 offenses for which points are assessed under Section 708.052,
 Transportation Code, to determine whether to hire or retain an
 employee or to contract with a person on whom criminal history
 record information is obtained under this section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2917 was passed by the House on May
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2917 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2917 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2917 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2917 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor