E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5119 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3180 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3180 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3180 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3180 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3180 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3180 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3180 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2144 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2698 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#627 | Journal Page: 2698 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2698 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2698 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2615 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2615 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2489 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2489 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |