Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3192
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Farias
|
Journal Page: 3192
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3192
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|