1 | 1 | | By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3215 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Intergovernmental Relations; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by |
---|
5 | 5 | | the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to |
---|
6 | 6 | | printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the establishment of a down payment assistance program |
---|
12 | 12 | | for certain professional educators by the Texas State Affordable |
---|
13 | 13 | | Housing Corporation. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter Y, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
16 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 2306.5622 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 2306.5622. PROFESSIONAL EDUCATORS DOWN PAYMENT |
---|
18 | 18 | | ASSISTANCE PROGRAM IN CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a) In this section: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) "Low-wealth school district" means a school |
---|
20 | 20 | | district that: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (A) has a low wealth per student, as determined |
---|
22 | 22 | | jointly by the commissioner of education and the corporation; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | (B) is located in a county with a population of |
---|
24 | 24 | | more than one million and in which more than 80 percent of the |
---|
25 | 25 | | population resides in a single municipality. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) "Professional educator" means a classroom |
---|
27 | 27 | | teacher, full-time paid teacher's aide, full-time librarian, |
---|
28 | 28 | | full-time counselor certified under Subchapter B, Chapter 21, |
---|
29 | 29 | | Education Code, or full-time school nurse. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (3) "Wealth per student" means the taxable value of |
---|
31 | 31 | | property in a school district, as determined under Subchapter M, |
---|
32 | 32 | | Chapter 403, divided by the number of students enrolled in the |
---|
33 | 33 | | district. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) The corporation, in consultation with the commissioner |
---|
35 | 35 | | of education and low-wealth school districts, shall establish a |
---|
36 | 36 | | program providing to eligible professional educators down payment |
---|
37 | 37 | | assistance in the form of deferred forgivable second-lien loans. |
---|
38 | 38 | | Loans provided under this section must: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) with a total matching amount not to exceed $4,000 |
---|
40 | 40 | | as described by this subdivision, match each dollar of an eligible |
---|
41 | 41 | | professional educator's down payment contribution toward the |
---|
42 | 42 | | purchase of a home, with: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (A) a mandatory contribution, as funds are |
---|
44 | 44 | | available and not to exceed $2,000, from the corporation; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | (B) an additional optional contribution, not to |
---|
46 | 46 | | exceed $2,000, from the applicable low-wealth school district; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (2) be forgiven at the rate of one-third of the |
---|
48 | 48 | | original balance of the loan for each year that the professional |
---|
49 | 49 | | educator remains employed by the district after the issuance of the |
---|
50 | 50 | | loan. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (c) To be eligible for down payment assistance under this |
---|
52 | 52 | | section, a professional educator must: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) be employed by a low-wealth school district for |
---|
54 | 54 | | the six-month period preceding the application date; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (2) have an income that does not exceed the greater of: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (A) 115 percent of area median family income, |
---|
57 | 57 | | adjusted for family size; or |
---|
58 | 58 | | (B) the maximum amount permitted by Section |
---|
59 | 59 | | 143(f), Internal Revenue Code of 1986; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (3) meet the creditworthiness and purchase price |
---|
61 | 61 | | standards established by corporation rule; |
---|
62 | 62 | | (4) complete a homebuyer education course; |
---|
63 | 63 | | (5) occupy the purchased home as the educator's |
---|
64 | 64 | | primary residence; and |
---|
65 | 65 | | (6) purchase a home in the low-wealth school district |
---|
66 | 66 | | in which the professional educator is employed. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (d) A professional educator who receives down payment |
---|
68 | 68 | | assistance through a second-lien loan under this section shall |
---|
69 | 69 | | repay the outstanding balance of the loan if the person: |
---|
70 | 70 | | (1) ceases to be a professional educator employed by |
---|
71 | 71 | | the low-wealth school district in which the home is located; or |
---|
72 | 72 | | (2) ceases to occupy the home as the educator's primary |
---|
73 | 73 | | residence. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (e) The corporation may contract with the State Board for |
---|
75 | 75 | | Educator Certification, the Texas Education Agency, or other |
---|
76 | 76 | | agencies of the state or with private entities to: |
---|
77 | 77 | | (1) determine whether applicants qualify as |
---|
78 | 78 | | professional educators under this section; or |
---|
79 | 79 | | (2) otherwise administer all or part of this section. |
---|
80 | 80 | | (f) The board of directors of the corporation may set and |
---|
81 | 81 | | collect from each applicant any fees the board considers reasonable |
---|
82 | 82 | | and necessary to cover the expenses of administering the program. |
---|
83 | 83 | | (g) The board of directors of the corporation shall adopt |
---|
84 | 84 | | program guidelines governing: |
---|
85 | 85 | | (1) the administration of the program; |
---|
86 | 86 | | (2) the issuance of down payment assistance under the |
---|
87 | 87 | | program; |
---|
88 | 88 | | (3) creditworthiness and purchase price standards; |
---|
89 | 89 | | and |
---|
90 | 90 | | (4) the verification of occupancy of the home as the |
---|
91 | 91 | | professional educator's principal residence. |
---|
92 | 92 | | (h) The corporation shall ensure that down payment |
---|
93 | 93 | | assistance under this section is structured in a way that complies |
---|
94 | 94 | | with any requirements associated with the source of the funds used |
---|
95 | 95 | | for the assistance. |
---|
96 | 96 | | (i) The corporation may solicit and accept funding for the |
---|
97 | 97 | | program from the following sources: |
---|
98 | 98 | | (1) low-wealth school districts; |
---|
99 | 99 | | (2) gifts and grants for the purposes of this section; |
---|
100 | 100 | | (3) any state or federal programs that provide money |
---|
101 | 101 | | that may be used for the purposes of this section; and |
---|
102 | 102 | | (4) amounts received by the corporation in any |
---|
103 | 103 | | repayments of loans made under this section. |
---|
104 | 104 | | SECTION 2. The Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation |
---|
105 | 105 | | shall adopt the program guidelines required by Section |
---|
106 | 106 | | 2306.5622(g), Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than |
---|
107 | 107 | | December 1, 2009. |
---|
108 | 108 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
109 | 109 | | * * * * * |
---|