Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3215 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3215
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a down payment assistance program
 for certain professional educators by the Texas State Affordable
 Housing Corporation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Y, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.5622 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.5622.  PROFESSIONAL EDUCATORS DOWN PAYMENT
 ASSISTANCE PROGRAM IN CERTAIN COUNTIES.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Low-wealth school district" means a school
 district that:
 (A)  has a low wealth per student, as determined
 jointly by the commissioner of education and the corporation; and
 (B)  is located in a county with a population of
 more than one million and in which more than 80 percent of the
 population resides in a single municipality.
 (2)  "Professional educator" means a classroom
 teacher, full-time paid teacher's aide, full-time librarian,
 full-time counselor certified under Subchapter B, Chapter 21,
 Education Code, or full-time school nurse.
 (3)  "Wealth per student" means the taxable value of
 property in a school district, as determined under Subchapter M,
 Chapter 403, divided by the number of students enrolled in the
 district.
 (b)  The corporation, in consultation with the commissioner
 of education and low-wealth school districts, shall establish a
 program providing to eligible professional educators down payment
 assistance in the form of deferred forgivable second-lien loans.
 Loans provided under this section must:
 (1)  with a total matching amount not to exceed $4,000
 as described by this subdivision, match each dollar of an eligible
 professional educator's down payment contribution toward the
 purchase of a home, with:
 (A)  a mandatory contribution, as funds are
 available and not to exceed $2,000, from the corporation; and
 (B)  an additional optional contribution, not to
 exceed $2,000, from the applicable low-wealth school district; and
 (2)  be forgiven at the rate of one-third of the
 original balance of the loan for each year that the professional
 educator remains employed by the district after the issuance of the
 loan.
 (c)  To be eligible for down payment assistance under this
 section, a professional educator must:
 (1)  be employed by a low-wealth school district for
 the six-month period preceding the application date;
 (2) have an income that does not exceed the greater of:
 (A)  115 percent of area median family income,
 adjusted for family size; or
 (B)  the maximum amount permitted by Section
 143(f), Internal Revenue Code of 1986;
 (3)  meet the creditworthiness and purchase price
 standards established by corporation rule;
 (4) complete a homebuyer education course;
 (5)  occupy the purchased home as the educator's
 primary residence; and
 (6)  purchase a home in the low-wealth school district
 in which the professional educator is employed.
 (d)  A professional educator who receives down payment
 assistance through a second-lien loan under this section shall
 repay the outstanding balance of the loan if the person:
 (1)  ceases to be a professional educator employed by
 the low-wealth school district in which the home is located; or
 (2)  ceases to occupy the home as the educator's primary
 residence.
 (e)  The corporation may contract with the State Board for
 Educator Certification, the Texas Education Agency, or other
 agencies of the state or with private entities to:
 (1)  determine whether applicants qualify as
 professional educators under this section; or
 (2) otherwise administer all or part of this section.
 (f)  The board of directors of the corporation may set and
 collect from each applicant any fees the board considers reasonable
 and necessary to cover the expenses of administering the program.
 (g)  The board of directors of the corporation shall adopt
 program guidelines governing:
 (1) the administration of the program;
 (2)  the issuance of down payment assistance under the
 program;
 (3)  creditworthiness and purchase price standards;
 and
 (4)  the verification of occupancy of the home as the
 professional educator's principal residence.
 (h)  The corporation shall ensure that down payment
 assistance under this section is structured in a way that complies
 with any requirements associated with the source of the funds used
 for the assistance.
 (i)  The corporation may solicit and accept funding for the
 program from the following sources:
 (1) low-wealth school districts;
 (2) gifts and grants for the purposes of this section;
 (3)  any state or federal programs that provide money
 that may be used for the purposes of this section; and
 (4)  amounts received by the corporation in any
 repayments of loans made under this section.
 SECTION 2. The Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation
 shall adopt the program guidelines required by Section
 2306.5622(g), Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 December 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *