E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6301
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1641
|
Journal Page: 6300
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6290
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6899
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4833
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2883
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1881
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#416
|
Journal Page: 2174
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2174
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2174
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Orr
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|